IL HB0256 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Educator Licensure Article of School Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, in order to obtain a license under the Article, a student teacher candidate may not be required to videotape himself or herself or his or her students in a classroom setting. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-STUDENT TEACHER-VIDEO

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
2019-10-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-09-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-09-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2019-09-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-09-11SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-02SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED)
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Education
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 083-023-000
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-11HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-003-000
2019-03-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-03-12HouseSuspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-03-12HouseMoved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
2019-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-01-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2019-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-30Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback