IL HB0270 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that if a purchaser makes payment over the phone, in writing, or via the Internet, and the property is delivered to a location in this State, then the sale shall be sourced to the location where the property is delivered. Provides that the sale shall be deemed to have occurred at the customer's address if the property is delivered and the delivery location is unknown. Amends the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the Flood Prevention District Act, the Local Mass Transit District Act, and the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that a unit of local government may require a retailer to collect and remit certain use and occupation taxes if the retailer qualifies as a "retailer maintaining a place of business in this State" under certain provisions of the Use Tax Act.
Title
LOCAL ROT-SOURCING-COLLECTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-02-07 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-01-10 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 120 | 2-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1006.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1006.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3610 | 5.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3615 | 4.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 750 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=270&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0270.htm |