IL HB0271 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0041
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0041
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Protection District Act. Provides that all proposals to award contracts involving amounts in excess of $20,000 shall be published at least 10 days in advance of the date announced for the receiving of bids, in a secular English language newspaper (rather than a secular English language daily newspaper) of general circulation throughout the district. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRE PROTECTION DIST-PUBLISH
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Mike Murphy [R] | Rep. Randy Frese [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] |
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0041 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date July 12, 2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 705 | 11k | Amended Code | Citation Text |