IL HB0303 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Wage Increase Transparency Act. Provides that "disclosable payment" also includes accumulated sick leave. Effective immediately.
Title
DISCLOSABLE PAYMENT-SICK LEAVE
Sponsors
Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] |
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0228 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 155 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |