IL HB0331 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0042
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Expressway Safety Act. Provides that the Illinois State Police, the Illinois Department of Transportation, and the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority shall work together to conduct a program to increase the amount of cameras along expressways in Cook County. Provides that images from the cameras may be used to investigate offenses and detect roadway hazards, but not to enforce petty offenses. Provides that the program shall be funded by the Road Fund. Repeals the Act on July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EXPRESSWAY SAFETY ACT-CAMERAS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0042
2019-07-12HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-07-12HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Transportation; 013-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Transportation
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-001
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 013-000-000
2019-03-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback