IL HB0334 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a charter school operating within the City of Chicago shall be administered by a local school council. Provides that a local school council shall be established for each small school, contract school, and military school within the Chicago school district. Provides that in each attendance center enrolling students in 7th or 8th grade, one full-time student member shall be appointed, although no attendance center shall have more than one student member. Requires a supermajority of 8 votes by the local school council to veto any action proposed or approved regarding certain schools placed on probation and intervention actions by the Chicago Schools Academic Accountability Council. Creates the LSC Certification Commission to provide fundamental training to members of local school councils and certify each member, and sets forth its composition. Sets forth a mandatory training program for local school council members. Provides that the LSC Certification Commission may request and, upon such request, the Chicago Board of Education shall budget and distribute such funds as are equal to the total allocations for the certification of local school council members in the year immediately prior. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-CHI CHARTER SCH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-12 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-13 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-2.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-2.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-2.3b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-2.4b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-8.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-8.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=334&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0334.htm |