IL HB0344 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Authorized Electronic Monitoring in Community-Integrated Living Arrangements and Developmental Disability Facilities Act. Provides that under certain conditions, a resident of a living arrangement certified under the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act and a resident of a developmental disability facility shall be permitted to use an audio and video surveillance system in his or her room at his or her own expense. Requires the electronic monitoring device to be placed in a conspicuously visible location in the room. Requires the Department of Human Services to establish a program to distribute specified funds each year for the purchase and installation of electronic monitoring devices. Establishes criminal penalties for a person or entity that knowingly hampers, obstructs, tampers with, or destroys an electronic monitoring device. Contains provisions concerning: resident and roommate consent to monitoring; notice of electronic monitoring to the staff and visitors; limitations on the staff's access to recordings; the admissibility of recordings in civil, criminal, and administrative actions; staff reporting; liability; and rulemaking. Makes other changes. Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act and Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code to make conforming changes. Provides that it is a business offense for a person to discriminate or retaliate against a resident for consenting to the electronic monitoring, or to prevent the installation or use of an electronic monitoring device by a resident who has provided specified notice and consent. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
AUTHORIZED ELECTRONIC MONITOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0229 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2019-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 135 | 14.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
405 | 5 | 2-116 | New Code | See Bill Text |