IL HB0350 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-14)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teachers and State Universities Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires an employer to make an additional employer contribution for a participant whose earnings for any academic year used to determine the final rate of earnings exceed the amount of his or her earnings with the same employer for the previous academic year by more than 6% (instead of 3%). Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-EMPLOYER CONTRIBUTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-003-001 |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-01-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-01-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-01-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-01-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-01-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-01-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 15-155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |