IL HB0354 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that upon establishing the compensation of board of review employees fixed by the county board, the county shall, at all times, ensure that each of the commissioners on the board of review receives equitable resources and staffing. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-BD OF REVIEW RESOURCES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-02-14 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-01-15 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-01-15 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-01-15 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-01-15 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-01-15 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-01-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=354&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0354.htm |