IL HB0369 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax deduction in an amount equal to the out-of-pocket costs incurred by a taxpayer during the taxable year for expenses associated with long-term care for the taxpayer or the taxpayer's family member. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-LONG TERM CARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=369&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0369.htm |