IL HB0423 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Failed on November 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-01 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Failed on November 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-01 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill as amended by House Amendment No.1 with the following changes. Restores provisions requiring the completion of a teacher performance assessment and a test of content area knowledge for the issuance of certain educator licenses. Makes the provisions removing the requirement of passage of a test of basic skills applicable until June 30, 2025. Provides that, on or before July 1, 2025, the State Board of Education must reevaluate the method it uses to score a content area knowledge test and may adopt rules to make any changes to those methods. Removes the provision requiring a candidate in a teacher preparation program to receive a letter grade of at least a "C", or its equivalent, in his or her student teaching program to obtain the license. Makes conforming changes. Adds an immediate effective date (rather than a July 1, 2020 effective date).
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-01 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2019-10-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Tabled |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 085-025-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Withdrawn by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 007-001-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-003-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 006-002-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-26 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-26 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-03-26 | House | Re-assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-03-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 129 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |