IL HB0437 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Library District Act of 1991. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning captions.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Connor |
2019-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 16 | 1-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |