IL HB0449 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning commencement of actions and forms of process.
Title
CIVIL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 2-201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=449&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0449.htm |