IL HB0457 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning noise.
Title
SAFETY-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |