IL HB0465 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-17)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Electronic Fund Transfer Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning powers and duties under the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateDo Pass Insurance; 018-000-000
2019-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2019-04-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-04-25SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Insurance
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; 011-000-000
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2019-04-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; 016-000-000
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
2019-03-19HouseRe-assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-03-14HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2019-03-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20561620Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback