IL HB0471 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Postponed - Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Foreign Banking Office Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors

Rep. Bob Morgan [D]Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D]Rep. Mary Flowers [D]Rep. Sara Feigenholtz [D]
Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D]Rep. Karina Villa [D]Rep. Mark Walker [D]Rep. Gregory Harris [D]
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D]Rep. John Connor [D]Rep. Daniel Didech [D]Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D]
Rep. Monica Bristow [D]Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D]Rep. Michael Halpin [D]Rep. Sue Scherer [D]
Rep. Will Guzzardi [D]Rep. Celina Villanueva [D]Rep. Delia Ramirez [D]Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D]
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D]Rep. Michelle Mussman [D]Rep. Mary Edly-Allen [D]Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D]
Rep. Arthur Turner [D]Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D]Rep. Robert Martwick [D]Rep. Deborah Conroy [D]
Rep. Maurice West [D]Rep. Yehiel Kalish [D]Rep. Rita Mayfield [D]Rep. Natalie Manley [D]
Rep. Carol Ammons [D]Rep. Justin Slaughter [D]Rep. Anna Moeller [D]Rep. Sam Yingling [D]
Rep. Ann Williams [D]Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D]Rep. Emanuel Welch [D]Rep. Fred Crespo [D]
Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D]Rep. Joyce Mason [D]Rep. Sonya Harper [D]Rep. Katie Stuart [D]
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D]Rep. Marcus Evans [D]Rep. Diane Pappas [D]Rep. Kathleen Willis [D]
Rep. Theresa Mah [D]Rep. Jaime Andrade [D]Rep. Aaron Ortiz [D]Rep. John D'Amico [D]
Rep. Martin Moylan [D]Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D]Rep. Kelly Burke [D]Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D]
Rep. Robert Rita [D]Sen. Laura Fine [D]Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D]Sen. Linda Holmes [D]
Sen. Laura Murphy [D]Sen. Julie Morrison [D]Sen. Robert Peters [D]

Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenatePostponed - Insurance
2019-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
2019-05-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2019-05-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2019
2019-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-15SenatePostponed - Insurance
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-09SenatePostponed - Insurance
2019-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-01SenateAssigned to Insurance
2019-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-041-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-04-08HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 013-004-000
2019-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2056451Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback