IL HB0626 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Prevention of Cigarette Sales to Minors Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning statements for delivery sales.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7206789Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback