IL HB0808 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Reduces the fee for original, renewal, and duplicate standard Illinois Identification Cards issued to persons under 18 years of age from $10 to $5.
Title
SOS-ID CARDS UNDER AGE 18
Sponsors
Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Randy Frese [R] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Aaron Ortiz [D] |
Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0232 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |