IL HB0815 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Freedom from Aggressive Insurance Increases Review Act. Creates the independent, quasi-judicial Health Insurance Rate Review Board to ensure insurance rates are reasonable and justified. Sets forth duties and prohibited activities concerning the Board. Sets forth the procedures for appointment to the Board. Provides requirements and procedures for health carriers to file current and proposed rates and rate schedules with the Board. Provides that the Board shall review and approve or disapprove all rates and rate schedules filed or used by a health carrier. Sets forth provisions concerning rate standards, public notice, hearings, and the disapproval and approval of rates and rate schedules. Requires the Board to annually report to the General Assembly all rate and rate schedules approved, disapproved, and amended.
Title
FREEDOM FROM INS INCREASES ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-02-19 | House | To Health Insurance Subcommittee |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |