IL HB0821 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law in the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for levy years 2019 and later, for school districts, the "aggregate extension base" is the greater of (A) the district's last preceding aggregate extension limit or (B) the district's last preceding aggregate extension, subject to certain adjustments. Provides that the term "aggregate extension limit" means the district's last preceding aggregate extension if the taxing district had utilized the maximum limiting rate permitted without referendum for each of the 3 immediately preceding levy years. Effective immediately.
Title
PTELL-SCHOOL DISTRICTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=821&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0821.htm |