IL HB0822 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on August 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0428
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on August 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0428
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Care of Students with Diabetes Act. Provides that a school may maintain a supply of glucagon medication in any secure location that is accessible before, during, or after school where a student is most at risk, including, but not limited to, a classroom or the nurse's office; defines "glucagon medication" and "undesignated glucagon medication". Provides that a physician, a physician assistant who has prescriptive authority, or an advanced practice registered nurse who has prescriptive authority may prescribe undesignated glucagon medication in the name of the school to be maintained for use when necessary. Allows a delegated care aide to carry undesignated glucagon medication. Provides that within 24 hours after the administration of undesignated glucagon medication, a school must notify the school nurse and the student's parent or guardian or emergency contact, if known, and health care provider of its use. Effective immediately.
Title
UNDESIGNATED GLUCAGON-SCHOOLS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0428 |
2019-08-19 | House | Effective Date August 19, 2019 |
2019-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 017-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 145 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 145 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 145 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 145 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |