IL HB0823 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Sickle Cell Prevention, Care, and Treatment Program Act. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to establish a grant program for the purpose of providing for the prevention, care, and treatment of sickle cell disease and for educational programs concerning the disease. Requires the Department to: (1) develop application criteria and standards of eligibility for groups or organizations that apply for funds under the program; and (2) make available grants to groups and organizations who meet the eligibility standards set by the Department. Provides that the highest priority for grants shall be accorded to established sickle cell disease community-based organizations, and priority shall be given to ensuring the establishment of sickle cell disease centers in underserved areas that have a higher population of sickle cell disease patients. Requires the Department to determine the maximum amount available for each grant; determine policies for the expiration and renewal of grants; require that all grant funds be used for the purpose of prevention, care, and treatment of sickle cell disease or for educational programs concerning the disease; and develop a sickle cell disease educational outreach program that includes the dissemination of educational materials to specified persons and institutions. Permits the Department to contract with an entity to implement the sickle cell disease educational outreach program. Requires the Department to adopt rules. Requires the Department to conduct a study to determine the prevalence, impact, and needs of individuals with sickle cell disease and the sickle cell trait in Illinois. Provides that implementation of the Act is subject to appropriation. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Sickle Cell Chronic Disease Fund.
Title
IDPH-PHLEBOTOMY-TRAINING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Prevailed |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2020 |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Hunter |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2020 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-04-05 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-13 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-01-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-01-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-01-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-01-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-01-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-01-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-01-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-01-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |