IL HB0827 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides for the election of the board of trustees of the City Colleges of Chicago, Illinois Community College District No. 508, at the general primary election in 2020 on a nonpartisan ballot. Provides that a member of the board of trustees shall be elected at each consolidated election thereafter. Makes related changes. Amends the Public Community College Act. Sets forth provisions concerning nominating petitions and ballots. Provides that the City of Chicago shall be subdivided into 20 trustee districts by the General Assembly for seats on the board of trustees, in addition to one at-large trustee. Provides that in the year following each decennial census, the General Assembly shall redistrict the trustee districts to reflect the results of each decennial census. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COM COL-CHICAGO-ELECT BOARD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 010-001-000
2019-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2019-05-01HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-01HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-22HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-22HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1052A-1.2Amended CodeCitation Text
1052A-52Amended CodeCitation Text
1108057-1Amended CodeCitation Text
1108057-2Amended CodeCitation Text
1108057-2.1New CodeSee Bill Text
1108057-2.2New CodeSee Bill Text
1108057-2.3New CodeSee Bill Text
1108057-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback