IL HB0837 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Legislative Youth Advisory Council Act. Provides that the purpose of the Council is to facilitate communication between the youth of the State of Illinois and the elected branches of State government regarding the issues, interests, and needs important to youth in the State of Illinois. Creates an Advisory Board, consisting of 2 members of the House of Representatives, one each appointed by the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the Minority Leader of the House of Representatives; and 2 members of the Senate, one each appointed by the President of the Senate and the Minority Leader of the Senate, to facilitate the functions of the Council. Provides for the application and nomination process for prospective members of the Council. Sets forth membership and meeting requirements and the powers of the Council. Provides that members of the Council shall serve one-year terms, but may be re-elected if they continue to be nominated and qualified to serve as members. Provides for the election of a President, Secretary, Treasurer, and Clerk at the first Council meeting of the year. Requires the Council to submit an annual report to the General Assembly and the Governor. Creates the Illinois Legislative Youth Advisory Council Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that all moneys in the Fund shall be used to reimburse Council members for actual expenses incurred in traveling to Council meetings, including travel, food, and lodging, and printing the annual report. Amends the State Finance Act. Adds the Illinois Legislative Youth Advisory Council Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

YOUTH ADVISORY COUNCIL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-06-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-06-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-06-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-06-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-06-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-06-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-06-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-06-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-06-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-06-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-06-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz
2019-06-01HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-06-01HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-06-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-06-01HouseArrived in House
2019-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2019-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-06-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-06-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-06-01Senate3/5 Vote Required
2019-06-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-06-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2019-06-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-06-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-06-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-06-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-06-01SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019
2019-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2019-05-01SenatePostponed - State Government
2019-04-29SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 084-026-000
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-11HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-03HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2019-04-01HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Avery Bourne
2019-03-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-03-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-02-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.891New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback