IL HB0838 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Keep Illinois Business Act. Provides that any recipient business that chooses to move all or part of its business operations and the jobs created by its business out-of-State shall be deemed to no longer qualify for State economic development assistance, and shall be required to pay to the relevant State granting agency the full amount of any economic development assistance it received. Provides for procedures for the recovery of economic development assistance, including required notice to the recipient business and an opportunity for a hearing. Defines terms.
Title
KEEP ILLINOIS BUSINESS ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-07-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-02-14 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=838&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0838.htm |