IL HB0884 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Finance Authority Act. Provides that the Illinois Finance Authority may administer a local infrastructure revolving loan program. Provides that the program shall, in instances where sufficient loan funds exist to permit applications to be accepted, provide zero-interest and low-interest loans to units of local government to be used for specified infrastructure projects. Creates the Local Infrastructure Revolving Loan Fund, and provides for the use of the Fund. Provides for a continuing appropriation of moneys from the Fund to the Authority for payment to units of local government for specified purposes. Provides for the maximum amount of the loan to be given and repayment of the loan. Authorizes the Authority to adopt rules to administer the program. Amends the State Finance Act to provide for the Local Infrastructure Revolving Loan Fund.
Title
LOCAL INFRASTRUCTURE LOAN PROG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-02-14 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael T. Marron |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3501 | 820-65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=884&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0884.htm |