IL HB0889 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-27)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-27)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Requires an individual or group policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan to provide coverage for long-term antibiotic therapy for a person with a tick-borne disease. Makes conforming changes in the Health Maintenance Organization Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code.
Title
INS CODE-TICK-BORNE DISEASE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0371 |
2019-08-13 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 012-000-000 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 017-002-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported Back To Insurance Committee; |
2019-03-12 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Insurance Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-20 | House | To Health Insurance Subcommittee |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-02-13 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-02-06 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-02-06 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |