IL HB0895 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Pilot Program Act. Removes the word "Pilot" from the Act's short title and the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Pilot Program. Makes conforming changes throughout the Act and statutes. Provides that autism, chronic pain, irritable bowel syndrome, migraines, osteoarthritis, anorexia nervosa, Ehlers-Danlos Syndrome, Neuro-Behcet's Autoimmune Disease, neuropathy, polycystic kidney disease, superior canal dehiscence syndrome, and medical conditions or symptoms for which a person may benefit from the use of medical cannabis are debilitating medical conditions. Provides that possessing cannabis in a vehicle not open to the public unless the medical cannabis is in a reasonably secured, sealed, container (rather than a tamper-evident container) and reasonably inaccessible while the vehicle is moving is not permitted. Removes language providing that a physician may not accept, solicit, or offer any form of remuneration from or to a qualifying patient, primary caregiver, cultivation center, or dispensing organization other than accepting payment from a patient for the fee associated with a required examination. Provides that a qualifying patient under the age of 18 shall not be prohibited from having up to 3 (instead of 2) designated caregivers. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall establish procedures to permit qualified veterans to participate in the Opioid Alternative Pilot Program. Provides that any Department of Public Health-approved quantity waiver process must be made available to qualified veterans. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall provide for immediate changes to a registered qualifying patient's designated registered dispensing organization. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall adopt rules permitting returns, and potential refunds, for damaged or inadequate products. Repeals a provision concerning changing a designated dispensing organization. Repeals a provision repealing the Act on July 1, 2020.
Title
HEALTH-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-001-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-20 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-001-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 130 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |