IL HB0898 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Defines "retired law enforcement officer qualified under federal law" for purposes of the Act to permit the carrying of a concealed weapon. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012, the Unified Code of Corrections, and the County Jail Act. Permits currently employed and qualified retired State correctional officers and county correctional officers to carry their own firearms off-duty without being in violation of the unlawful use of weapons and aggravated unlawful use of a weapon statutes if they meet certain training requirements. Provides that currently employed and qualified retired State correctional officers and county correctional officers shall carry a photographic identification and a valid annual firearm certificate while carrying their own firearms off-duty. Limited to correctional officers who have custody and control over inmates in an adult correctional facility. Effective immediately.
Title
CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS-FIREARMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-07-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-07-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-07-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-01-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-01-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-01-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-01-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 705 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 125 | 26.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=898&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0898.htm |