IL HB0907 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0045
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Directs the Department to create and maintain an online database and resource page on its website. Provides that the page shall contain mental health resources specifically geared towards school counselors, parents, and teachers with the goal of connecting those people with mental health resources related to bullying and school shootings and encouraging information sharing among educational administrators, school security personnel, and school resource officers. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDPH-MENTAL HEALTH RESOURCES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0045
2019-07-12HouseEffective Date July 12, 2019
2019-07-12HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2019
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2019-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Connor
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-07HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 018-000-000
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Mental Health Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Connor
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2019-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023102310-229New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback