IL HB0925 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mobile Home Local Services Tax Act. Provides that the penalty for delinquent local services taxes shall not exceed the lesser of $100 or 50% of the original tax imposed (currently, $100). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MOBILE HOME-PENALTY AMOUNT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 71 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 71 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 71 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-06-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-06-01HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-06-01HousePassed Both Houses
2019-06-01HouseHouse Concurs
2019-06-01House3/5 Vote Required
2019-06-01HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 071-044-000
2019-06-01HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 071-044-000
2019-06-01HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 071-044-000
2019-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-006-000
2019-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-006-000
2019-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-006-000
2019-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
2019-05-30HouseArrived in House
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Bush
2019-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bush
2019-05-30SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000
2019-05-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000
2019-05-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass Revenue; 007-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000
2019-03-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-03-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000
2019-03-21HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2019-03-21HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-02-14HouseTo Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355159Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=925&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0925.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0925eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0925enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0925ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0925ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0925sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0925sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0925sam003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB0925_04032019_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB0925_05302019_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB0925sam003_06012019_018002C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB0925sam002_06012019_018001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB0925sam001_06012019_018000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback