IL HB0927 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that notwithstanding any provision of the Act to the contrary, on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, all juvenile law enforcement records and juvenile court records are subject to automatic expungement if the underlying charge was not a crime of violence as defined in the Crime Victims Compensation Act. Provides that upon entry of a disposition for an eligible record, the minor shall be informed by the court of his or her right to have eligible records immediately expunged. Provides that the clerk shall deliver a certified copy of the expungement order to the Department of State Police and the arresting agency. Provides that the expungement shall be completed within 14 business days after the receipt of the expungement order. Allows retention of some information under special conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-AUTOMATIC EXPUNGEMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054055-915Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback