IL HB0961 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on January 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0622
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on January 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0622
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in a county with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants, for taxable years 2019 through 2023 (currently, 2020 through 2024), a taxpayer who has been granted a senior citizens homestead exemption need not reapply. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0622 |
2020-01-14 | House | Effective Date January 14, 2020 |
2020-01-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-12-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-11-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 14, 2019 |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019 |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-10-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-10-30 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-10-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2019-10-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-10-24 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-10-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019 |
2019-10-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-21 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 610 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |