IL HB1438 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-4)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0027
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Pawnbroker Regulation Act. Removes language providing that when a person is found to be the owner of stolen property that has been pawned, the property shall be returned to the owner without payment of money advanced to the pawnbroker or any costs or charges. Provides that stolen property subject to a hold order shall be returned to the owner without the payment. Provides that when a hold order expires, title to the property shall vest in the pawnbroker. Provides that a hold order must specify certain information concerning the criminal investigation and property subject to the hold order. Sets forth the requirements for the contents of the hold order. Provides that a pawnbroker or its representative must sign and date a copy of a hold order as evidence of receipt of the hold order and the beginning of the 90-day hold period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CANNABIS REGULATION & TAX ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 66 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0027
2019-06-25HouseEffective Date June 25, 2019
2019-06-25HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-06HouseSent to the Governor
2019-06-04HousePassed Both Houses
2019-06-04HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-05-31HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 066-047-002
2019-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-006-000
2019-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-05-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-05-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-05-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-05-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-05-29HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-05-29HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-05-29HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2019-05-29HouseArrived in House
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 038-017-002
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Steans
2019-05-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-003-002
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
2019-05-28SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-05-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-23SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
2019-05-02SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20551012Amended CodeCitation Text
2055109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1438&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1438.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1438eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1438enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0027.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1438ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1438sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1438sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB1438_04032019_028000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB1438_05292019_025000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB1438sam002_05312019_002000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback