IL HB1439 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Creates a third-party facilitator license. Establishes licensing fees, recordkeeping requirements, reporting requirements, and other requirements for a third-party facilitator licensee. Provides that a retailer may deliver alcoholic liquors to the home or other designated location of a consumer in this State if specified conditions are met, including verifying that the individual accepting the delivery is at least 21 years of age. Provides that a retailer may use the services of a third-party facilitator by means of the Internet or mobile application to facilitate the sale of alcoholic liquors to be delivered to the home or other designated location of a consumer in this State if specified conditions are met, including verifying that the individual accepting the delivery is at least 21 years of age. Provides that the Illinois Liquor Control Commission may not treat a violation of those conditions as a violation by the retailer. Preempts home rule powers. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-HOME DELIVERY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 3-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 6-18.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
235 | 5 | 6-29.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1439&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1439.htm |