IL HB1440 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill. Adds requirements and recommendations of the report created by the Sexual Assault Evidence Tracking and Reporting Commission issued on June 26, 2018 for implementation of the sexual assault evidence tracking system. Effective immediately.
Title
TRACK-SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDENCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-27 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-02-13 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 70 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 202 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 5-9-1.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |