IL HB1441 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Wholesale Importation of Prescription Drugs Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to design an importation program where the State is the licensed wholesaler of imported drugs from licensed, regulated Canadian suppliers. Requires the program to address specified issues, including billing issues, cost savings issues, and safety and regulatory issues. Contains auditing and reporting requirements. Provides that the Department shall enlist the assistance of the Attorney General to identify the potential for anti-competitive behavior in industries that would be affected by an importation program. Requires the Department to submit a formal request to the Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services for certification of the importation program. Requires the Department to have the program operational within 6 months after receiving the certification. Contains provisions concerning implementation requirements.
Title
IMPORTED PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-02-04 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2019-03-21 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-21 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2019-03-20 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2019-03-20 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-20 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2019-03-20 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2019-03-20 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2019-03-19 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2019-03-19 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-19 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-19 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-19 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-19 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-19 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-19 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-19 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-19 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-19 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1441&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1441.htm |