IL HB1458 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Defines "communication" and "restorative justice practice". Provides that communications received by a party in preparation for, during, or after a restorative justice practice are inadmissible in court unless the privilege is: waived by the party or parties about whom the communication concerns; subject to certain exemptions; or used in furtherance of a criminal act.
Title
EVIDENCE-RESTORATIVE JUSTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |