IL HB1465 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that the Illinois Juvenile Justice Commission in its annual submission of recommendation to the Governor and General Assembly shall include recommendations regarding the inclusion of emerging adults into a developmentally appropriate justice system, reducing recidivism, and preventing deeper criminal involvement. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides in the Article concerning delinquent minors that on and after January 1, 2020, "delinquent minor" includes a minor who prior to his or her 19th birthday has violated or attempted to violate, regardless of where the act occurred, a federal law or State law, or county or municipal ordinance and the law or ordinance is classified as a misdemeanor offense. Provides that on and after January 1, 2022, "delinquent minor" includes a minor who prior to his or her 21st birthday has violated or attempted to violate, regardless of where the act occurred, a federal law or State law or county or municipal ordinance and the law or ordinance is classified as a misdemeanor offense. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act apply to violations or attempted violations committed on or after the effective of the amendatory Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV COURT-DELINQUENT MINOR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2050517a-9Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback