IL HB1468 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that the Illinois Juvenile Justice Commission shall study and make recommendations to the General Assembly regarding the availability of youth services to reduce the use of detention and prevent deeper criminal involvement. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that a provision providing a minor 10 years of age or older arrested under the Act where there is probable cause to believe that the minor is a delinquent minor and that: (i) secure custody is a matter of immediate and urgent necessity for the protection of the minor or of the person or property of another; (ii) the minor is likely to flee the jurisdiction of the court; or (iii) the minor was taken into custody under a warrant, may be kept or detained in an authorized detention facility and that a minor under 13 years of age shall not be admitted, kept, or detained in a detention facility unless a local youth service provider has been contacted and has not been able to accept the minor for services shall be inoperative on and after July 1, 2019. Provides that on and after July 1, 2019, any minor 13 years of age or older arrested under this Act where there is probable cause to believe that the minor is a delinquent minor and that: (i) secure custody is a matter of immediate and urgent necessity for the protection of the minor or of the person or property of another; (ii) the minor is likely to flee the jurisdiction of the court; or (iii) the minor was taken into custody under a warrant, may be kept or detained in an authorized detention facility. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-AGE OF DETENTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-17HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2019-05-16HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2019-05-07HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-07HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-04-16HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2019-04-12HouseJudicial Note Filed
2019-04-12HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2019-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HousePension Note Filed
2019-04-11HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-04-11HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2019-04-11HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-04-10HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-005-000
2019-04-09HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-09HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-09HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-09HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-09HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-09HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-09HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-09HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-04-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-04-05HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-04-01HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-04-01HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2019-03-13HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2050517a-9Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-410Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-710Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-720Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback