IL HB1471 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0048
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0048
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Trust Code. Provides that the Code applies to express trusts, charitable or noncharitable, and trusts created pursuant to a statute, judgment, or decree that requires the trust to be administered in the manner of an express trust. Defines terms. Adds provisions governing: judicial proceedings; representation; creation, validity, modification, and termination of trusts; creditor's claims; spendthrift and discretionary trusts; revocable trusts; the office of trustee; duties and powers of the trustee; the Illinois Prudent Investor Law; life insurance; affiliated investments; liability of trustees and rights of persons dealing with a trustee; total return trusts; trust decanting; the Uniform Powers of Appointment Law; perpetuities; and application of the Code to existing trusts. Repeals the Trusts and Trustees Act, the Trusts and Dissolutions of Marriage Act, the Uniform Powers of Appointment Act (added by Public Act 100-1044), the Statute Concerning Perpetuities, the Perpetuities Vesting Act, and the Trust Accumulation Act. Makes corresponding changes in the Public Use Trust Act, the Township Code, the Corporate Fiduciary Act, the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act, the Title Insurance Act, the Illinois Funeral or Burial Funds Act, the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code, the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act, the Probate Act of 1975, the Illinois Power of Attorney Act, the Common Trust Fund Act, the Religious Corporation Act, and the Illinois Pre-Need Cemetery Sales Act. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
ILLINOIS TRUST CODE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0048 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-02-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-02-27 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-15 | House | To Constitutional Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-15 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 620 | 1-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 620 | 6-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 620 | 9-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 135 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 155 | 21.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 45 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 45 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 160 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
405 | 5 | 3-605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
405 | 5 | 3-819 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
405 | 5 | 5-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 135-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 513.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 45 | 3-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 2-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 28-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 105 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
760 | 35 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
760 | 45 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 5 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
765 | 305 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
765 | 310 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
765 | 315 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
805 | 110 | 46j | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 390 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |