IL HB1473 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Youthbuild Act. In language providing that the Secretary of Human Services shall make grants to applicants for the purpose of carrying out approved Youthbuild programs, deletes language providing that the grantmaking is subject to appropriation. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
DHS-YOUTHBUILD PROGRAMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1315 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1473&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1473.htm |