IL HB1478 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Manufacturing Job Destination Tax Credit Act and amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides for a credit of 25% of the Illinois labor expenditures made by a manufacturing company in order to foster job creation and retention in Illinois. Authorizes the Department of Revenue to award a tax credit to taxpayer-employers who apply for the credit and meet the certain Illinois labor, job training, and apprenticeship requirements. Sets minimum requirements and procedures for certifying a taxpayer as an "accredited manufacturer" and for awarding the credit. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
MANUFACTURING JOB CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-02-28 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1478&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1478.htm |