IL HB1494 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0051
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0051
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides for the issuance of a 90-day permit to operate a motor vehicle that was donated to a not-for-profit organization for the purpose of donating the motor vehicle to a low-income individual. Provides that no more than 2 permits may be issued for any one vehicle. Provides that a vehicle may be operated with the temporary permit only for specific purposes. Provides that an applicant shall provide proof of the not-for-profit status organization and proof of liability insurance covering the vehicle. Provides that the not-for-profit shall assume all liability for the operation of the vehicle upon accepting the donation. Provides that the vehicle shall meet registration requirements to qualify for a temporary permit. Provides that a copy of the permit shall be kept inside the vehicle at all times. Provides for the issuance of Global War on Terrorism license plates to residents who have earned the Global War on Terrorism Expeditionary Medal. Provides that the surviving spouse of a military service member who has been issued a Global War on Terrorism license plate may retain the plate so long as the spouse is a resident of Illinois and transfers the registration to his or her name within 180 days of the death of the service member. Provides that an individual may reclass his or her registration or plate upon acquiring a Global War on Terrorism license plate without a replacement plate fee or registration sticker cost. Provides that a vehicle owner who has been approved for benefits under the Senior Citizens and Persons with Disabilities Property Tax Relief Act or who is the spouse of such a person shall pay a $24 registration fee for vehicles displaying a Global War on Terrorism license plate. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-NOT-FOR-PROFIT PERMIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0051 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date July 12, 2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chris Miller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-407.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-806.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |