IL HB1551 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Provides that a child shall continue to be eligible for an Individual Care Grant if the child is placed in the guardianship of the Department of Children and Family Services under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 because the child requires care in a residential treatment facility and an application for the Family Support Program was pending with the Department Healthcare and Family Services or an active application was being reviewed by the Department when the guardianship order was entered. Provides that any minor who is placed in the guardianship of the Department of Children and Family Services under the Act while an application for the Family Support Program was pending with the Department of Healthcare and Family Services or an active application was being reviewed by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall continue to be considered eligible for services if all other eligibility criteria are met. Provides that the court shall conduct a hearing within 14 days upon notification to all parties that an application for the Family Support Program services has been approved and services are available. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-FAMILY SUPPORT PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-20HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-20HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-17HouseArrived in House
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 007-000-000
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-02SenatePostponed - Human Services
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2019-04-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-04HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 009-000-000
2019-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 009-000-000
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2019-03-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-21HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2019-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-19HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000
2019-02-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2017057.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-711New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1551&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1551.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1551eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1551enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1551ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1551ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1551sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB1551_04042019_018000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB1551_05162019_024000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB1551sam001_05292019_026000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback