IL HB1552 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0052
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Provides that inter-track wagering location licensees must pay their pari-mutuel handle percentage to the municipality and county no later than the 20th of the month following the month the handle was generated. Provides that inter-track wagering location licensees must pay the admission fees to the municipality and county no later than the 20th of the month following the month the admission fees were imposed (rather than remitting the admission fees to the Illinois Racing Board within 48 hours and the Illinois Racing Board remitting the admission fees to the municipality or county).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HORSE RACING-LOCAL SHARE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0052
2019-07-12HouseEffective Date July 12, 2019
2019-07-12HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
230526Amended CodeCitation Text
230527Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback