IL HB1553 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill. Deletes language providing that the special immigrant minor provisions of the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 do not apply to a minor who applies for special immigrant minor status solely for the purpose of qualifying for financial assistance for himself or herself or for his or her parents, guardian, or custodian. Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act, Illinois Parentage Act of 2015, the Adoption Act, and the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that a court of the State that is competent to petitions under those Acts has jurisdiction to make the findings necessary to enable a child, who is the subject of the action, to petition the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services for classification as a Special Immigrant Juvenile under federal law. Provides that if a motion requests findings regarding Special Immigrant Juvenile Status under federal law, and the evidence, which may consist solely of, but is not limited to, a declaration by the child, supports the findings, the court shall issue an order with certain specifications. Makes other changes.
Title
JUV CT-SPECIAL IMMIGRANT MINOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0121 |
2019-07-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-003-001 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-018-002 |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 011-001-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 2-4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |