IL HB1581 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0033
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0033
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Credit Card Marketing Act of 2009. Creates the College Student Credit Card Marketing and Debt Task Force. Provides legislative findings. Provides for the membership of the Task Force. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall provide technical and administrative support and any other necessary assistance to the Task Force and shall be responsible for administering its operations and ensuring that the requirements of the provisions are met. Provides that the Task Force shall conduct a study on student credit card debt; specifies study requirements. Provides that the Task Force shall report the findings of the study conducted and any recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 14, 2019, at which time the Task Force shall be dissolved. Repeals these provisions on November 1, 2020. Effective immediately.
Title
CREDITCARD MARKETING TASKFORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0033 |
2019-06-28 | House | Effective Date June 28, 2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-035-002 |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 014-004-001 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |