IL HB1583 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill. Makes a technical change concerning the applicability of the introduced provision.
Title
CRIM PRO-ARREST WARRANTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0239 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-001 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 107-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |