IL HB1587 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that in imposing a sentence for an offense that requires a mandatory minimum sentence of imprisonment or probation or conditional discharge of 2 years or more, the court may sentence the offender to probation or conditional discharge or other non-imprisonment sentence it deems appropriate instead of to a sentence of imprisonment or to a lesser sentence of imprisonment, probation, or conditional discharge than the minimum sentence of imprisonment, probation, or conditional discharge provided for the offense if the court finds that the defendant does not pose a risk to public safety and the interest of justice requires the non-imposition of the mandatory sentence of imprisonment or a lesser sentence of imprisonment, probation, or conditional discharge. Provides that the court must state on the record its reasons for not imposing the minimum sentence of imprisonment or a lesser sentence of imprisonment, probation, or conditional discharge. Provides that if the defendant has been charged with an offense involving the use, possession, or discharge of a firearm, the court may not deviate from a mandatory minimum sentence or probation or conditional discharge requirement, unless it is the recommendation of a presentence investigation and there is clear articulable evidence that the defendant is not a threat to the public safety. Provides that an offender convicted of a sex offense or an offense involving the infliction of great bodily harm may not be sentenced to a lesser term of imprisonment, probation, or conditional discharge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-SENTENCING-REDUCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 48 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-24SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Jim Oberweis
2019-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 27, 2019
2019-05-24SenateThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 007-003-000
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 061-048-000
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-11HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-006-000
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-27HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73055-4-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback